KS SB357 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a portion of United States highway 81 as the Merle Miller memorial highway.
Title
Designating a portion of United States highway 81 as the Merle Miller memorial highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |