KS SB375 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of generative artificial intelligence to create false representations of candidates in election campaign media or of state officials.
Title
Prohibiting the use of generative artificial intelligence to create false representations of candidates in election campaign media or of state officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |