KS SB404 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting the use of expedited partner therapy to treat a sexually transmitted disease.
Title
Permitting the use of expedited partner therapy to treat a sexually transmitted disease.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |