KS SB415 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing criminal penalties for residential burglary.
Title
Increasing criminal penalties for residential burglary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 05, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |