KS SB43 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, March 20, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, March 20, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vacancy elections; United States representative to congress; clarifications.
Title
Vacancy elections; United States representative to congress; clarifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, March 20, 2017 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 13, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-03-08 | House | House Representative Esau raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Curtis |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Elections |
2017-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 06, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N - CANCELLED |
2017-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-02-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 159-S |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |