KS SB487 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing counties to contract with other counties to share 911 public safety answering point services and authorizing the distribution of 911 fee moneys to counties for such purposes.
Title
Authorizing counties to contract with other counties to share 911 public safety answering point services and authorizing the distribution of 911 fee moneys to counties for such purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 20, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |