KS SB489 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the department of corrections to establish a correctional center nursery for incarcerated expectant mothers and their child to allow certain expectant mothers to care and bond with their child for up to 36 months while incarcerated.
Title
Directing the department of corrections to establish a correctional center nursery for incarcerated expectant mothers and their child to allow certain expectant mothers to care and bond with their child for up to 36 months while incarcerated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |