KS SB51 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the state bank commissioner to accept state and national criminal history record checks from private entities.
Title
Authorizing the state bank commissioner to accept state and national criminal history record checks from private entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 7, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |