KS SB515 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for the Dane G. Hansen foundation.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for the Dane G. Hansen foundation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Introduced |