KS SB536 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring political subdivisions to adopt a budget that remains at or below revenue neutral and use funds to reduce property tax in order to receive local ad valorem tax reduction fund (LAVTRF) distributions.
Title
Requiring political subdivisions to adopt a budget that remains at or below revenue neutral and use funds to reduce property tax in order to receive local ad valorem tax reduction fund (LAVTRF) distributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |