KS SB70 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic liquor amendments relating to temporary permits, delivery of alcoholic liquors to consumers, common consumption areas and producer permits.
Title
Alcoholic liquor amendments relating to temporary permits, delivery of alcoholic liquors to consumers, common consumption areas and producer permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 4 (Y: 119 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 5 (Y: 119 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 4 (Y: 119 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 5 (Y: 119 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 |
2019-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 4 |
2019-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2019-04-03 | House | House Representative Clayton is appointed to replace Representative Ruiz, L. on the Conference Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Awerkamp and Representative Ruiz, L. appointed as conferees |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Estes , Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees |
2019-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 5 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-22 | House | House Hearing: Friday, March 22, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-03-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-14 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bowers was withdrawn |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bowers |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Estes was adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Estes |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Estes was adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Estes |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |