KS SR1723 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, March 13, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designating March 10, 2015 as Kansas TRIO Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating March 10, 2015 as Kansas TRIO Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-13SenateSenate Enrolled on Friday, March 13, 2015
2015-03-10SenateSenate Adopted without roll call
2015-03-10SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback