KS SR1757 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 14, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 14, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing February 11, 2020, as JAG-K Day at the Capitol.
Title
A resolution recognizing February 11, 2020, as JAG-K Day at the Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Bud Estes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 14, 2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Adopted without roll call |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sr1757/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sr1757_enrolled.pdf |