KY HB116 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 441.125 to remove the words "nonreligous sponsored" from the definition of "community-service-related project."
Title
AN ACT relating to jails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 572 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 64 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 64 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103) |
2018-03-21 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-21 | House | received in House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-31 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 |
2018-01-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018 |
2018-01-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-05 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB116.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB116/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB116/vote_history.pdf |