KY HB119 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 367.363 to define "protected person," "representative," and "sufficient proof of authority"; amend KRS 363.365 to require a consumer reporting agency to place a security freeze on a protected person's record or report upon proper request by a representative; require the freeze to be placed within twenty days of receiving the request; establish when the credit reporting agency is required to temporarily lift or remove the freeze; allow the credit reporting agency to charge a fee under certain circumstances; establish penalties for violations.
Title
AN ACT relating to credit freezes for consumers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-28 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 1, 2016 |
2016-01-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-12-11 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |