KY HB133 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to require public postsecondary institutions to provide new undergraduates with information regarding credit cards and debt management and encourage them to conduct informational sessions; encourage nonpublic postsecondary institutions to provide new undergraduates with information regarding credit cards and debt management and to conduct informational sessions; permit institutions to utilize existing debt education materials from nonprofit entities; and require the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to assist institutions in identifying appropriate materials and curricula.
Title
AN ACT relating to college student financial awareness.
Sponsors
Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | to Banking & Insurance (S) | |
2011-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | |
2011-02-16 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-05 | to Education (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB133.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB133/bill.doc |