KY HB139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 155)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 155)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create several new sections in KRS Chapter 41 to establish the Kentucky Financial Empowerment Commission, provide for the board of directors, establish that the State Treasurer shall serve as the chair of the board, confer all power and duties upon the Commission, and require the Auditor of Public Accounts to conduct an annual audit of the Commission.
Title
AN ACT relating to the creation of the Kentucky Financial Empowerment Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Duplessis [R] | Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. Chris Freeland [R] | Rep. Joe Graviss [D] |
Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1033 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 141 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 141 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 155) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | introduced in House |