KY HB159 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311 to define "health care provider" and "health services"; establish that health care providers are immune from criminal liability for harm arising from a health services-related act or omission other than gross negligence or wanton, willful, malicious, or intentional misconduct.
Title
AN ACT relating to immunity from criminal liability for health care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3033 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 90 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 90 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-25 | House | received in House |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 15, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-02-06 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-02-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 06, 2024 |
2024-02-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-31 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-30 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorney, Commonwealth's
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners