KY HB190 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-164 to prohibit insurers, pharmacy benefit managers, and other pharmacy benefit administrators from requiring or incentivizing the use of a mail-order pharmaceutical distributor; amend KRS 304.17C-125, 304.38A-115, 18A.225, and 164.2871 to apply provisions of amended KRS 304.17A-164 to limited health service benefit plans, including limited health service contracts, limited health service organizations, the state employee health plan, and postsecondary educational institution self-insured group health plans; repeal 304.38A-120, relating to assignment of certain benefits under limited health service organization plans, to consolidate like provisions; make technical corrections; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2025.
Title
AN ACT relating to pharmacy benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3327 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3322 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 487 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 270 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3322 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 487 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 270 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | House | passed 92-0 |
2024-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-04-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-04-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | received in House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2024-04-12 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-15 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-01-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Drugs and Medicines
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Local Mandate
Pharmacists
State Employees
Technical Corrections
Drugs and Medicines
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Local Mandate
Pharmacists
State Employees
Technical Corrections