KY HB207 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 16)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 16)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 45 of KRS Chapter 304 to require independent directors of a risk retention group and an attorney-in-fact for a reciprocal insurer to adhere to the same standards; establish a one year waiting period to qualify as independent; establish standards for and approval by the commissioner of material service provider contracts; require adoption of written policy for board of director responsibilities in the plan of operation; require and establish standards for an audit committee; allow for a waiver by the commissioner of certain audit committee requirements; establish and require disclosure of governance standards; require reporting to the commisioner of material noncompliance with the provisions of the section for risk retention groups; amend KRS 304.45-020 to define "board of directors," "director," "material relationship," and "material service provider contract"; amend KRS 304.45-030 to require notice to the commissioner of any other subsequent material changes to a risk retention group's plan of operation or feasibility study and make technical corrections; amend KRS 304.45-040 and 304.45-060 to conform; repeal and reenact KRS 304.45-050 to adopt alternative model language from the National Association of Insurance Commissioners; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2018.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 16) |
2017-03-06 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-06 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-03 | House | received in House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-1 |
2017-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2017 |
2017-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB207.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB207/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB207/vote_history.pdf |