KY HB221 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - posted in committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - posted in committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 202A.081 to require that the attorney and, if available, alternative sentencing social worker be present when an agreement for court-ordered community-based outpatient treatment is reached and allow a peer support specialist or other supportive person to be present with approval of the court; require the Department of Public Advocacy to assign an alternative sentencing social worker to any person under court order who shall develop a treatment plan in collaboration with a community mental health center; require the court to appoint a case manager or team employed by a community mental health center to monitor treatment adherence, report on the person's functioning, recommend community support services, and assist the person in applying for social services; require that the case manager or team is available 24/7 and adequately trained; require that providers use evidence-based practices and define the term; provide that failure to abide by the treatment plan may result in rehospitalization provided that the criteria are met, procedures are initiated via affidavit by the case manager or team, and mental health examinations take place at community mental health centers; and require that courts report such orders to the cabinet.
Title
AN ACT relating to court-ordered community-based outpatient treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-18 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-05 | House | reassigned to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-01-21 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | introduced in House |