KY HB230 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require that a health benefit plan that includes chiropractic benefits shall not impose a co-payment exceeding 50% of the total cost of the service provided and that the benefits, limitations, conditions and exclusions shall be clearly stated.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] | Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] |
Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Alecia Webb-Edgington [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-11 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-10 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-10 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011 | |
2011-02-10 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-09 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-02 | to Banking & Insurance (H) | |
2011-02-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB230.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB230/bill.doc |