KY HB230 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 116 to require the Secretary of State to quarterly issue a comprehensive status report regarding voter registration records cleanup and maintenance; establish information to be included the report.
Title
AN ACT relating to voter registration.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hodgson [R] | Rep. Jared Bauman [R] | Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Steve Rawlings [R] |
Rep. Nancy Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 202 (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 77-18 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-01 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | introduced in House |