KY HB244 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 403 to define terms; establish procedures; and establish parenting time credit; amend KRS 403.211 to establish which parent owes the initial $250 in medical expenses; amend KRS 403.090, 403.212, 403.740, 405.430, and 406.025 to conform; repeal KRS 403.2121, relating to child support obligations based upon parenting time.
Title
AN ACT relating to children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 475 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 3185 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 139 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 3185 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 139 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | House | passed 96-0 |
2024-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-04-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) as a consent bill |
2024-03-27 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-13 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-01-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-11 | House | introduced in House |