KY HB273 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 067)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 067)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 95A.210 and create a new section of KRS 95A.200 to 95A.300 to define and establish the Alan "Chip" Terry Professional Development and Wellness Program and create a fund for the program's administration; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to professional and volunteer firefighters programs, declaring an emergency, and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1043 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 200 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 200 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 067) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-12 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2019-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-20 | House | reassigned to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-08 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fire Prevention
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Fiscal Note
Mental Health
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fire Prevention
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Fiscal Note
Mental Health