KY HB29 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-14 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-14 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 171 establishing a Historic Farms Program; set out General Assembly findings; establish criteria and recognition process for a historic farm designation; allow for recognition of "heritage farms"; stipulate regulatory powers; repeal KRS 171.388; designate short title of "Young Family Farm Heritage Act."
Title
AN ACT relating to historic farms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-10 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-09 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with floor amendment (1) | |
2011-02-07 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 8, 2011 | |
2011-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | posting waived | |
2011-01-04 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB29.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB29/bill.doc |