KY HB29 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.503 to allow a local government to issue permits for racing events on state-maintained highways subject to apprvoal by the Transportation Cabinet; amend KRS 189.505 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3121 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 89 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 89 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2024-02-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 08, 2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-02 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Local Government
Motor Vehicles
Racing
State Agencies
Traffic Safety
Transportation
Local Government
Motor Vehicles
Racing
State Agencies
Traffic Safety
Transportation