KY HB31 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the Department for Medicaid Services and any managed care organization contracted for the delivery of Medicaid Services to provide coverage and reimbursement for at home prothrombin time or international normalized ratio (INR) testing, including but not limited to coverage and reimbursement for education and training, INR monitors or testing devices, and all necessary testing supplies; authorize the department to promulgate administrative regulations; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services or the Department for Medicaid Services to seek federal approval if is determined that such approval is necessary; require the cabinet to comply with KRS 205.525.
Title
AN ACT relating to Medicaid coverage for at-home anticoagulation management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3084 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 45 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 45 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-01-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2024-01-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2024 |
2024-01-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-24 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Medicaid
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Medical Assistance
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Medicaid
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Medical Assistance