KY HB317 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 286.4-530 to establish blended rate cap for certain consumer loans exceeding three thousand dollars ($3,000); make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to consumer loan companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-31 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-27 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb317.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb317/orig_bill.pdf |