KY HB348 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to require the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources to hold a postseason elk quota hunt for each year that a regular elk quota hunt is held; define terms; require the department to hold a postseason modern firearms elk quota hunt for anterless elk and spikes following the regular elk quota hunt; require hunters for the postseason quota hunt to be drawn from the pool of applicants who were not drawn for the regular quota hunt and who live in the elk restoration zone; require the department to draw a number of participants in the postseason quota hunt equal to the number of unused permits from the previous regular quota hunt or to draw 25 participants, whichever is greater; require postseason elk quota hunt participants to comply with regular quota hunt rules, except that they may only hunt in public and private hunting areas in the Knott County elk managment unit or the Stoney Fork elk management unit.
Title
AN ACT relating to elk hunting permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-24 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-22 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011 | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-15 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-08 | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) | |
2011-02-07 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB348.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB348/bill.doc |