KY HB360 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 185)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 185)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 100.111 to expand the definition of "agricultural use" to include at least five acres devoted to agritourism; redefine "agritourism activity" and define "inherent risks of agritourism activity"; amend KRS 219.081 to make a technical correction.
Title
AN ACT relating to agritourism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 185) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill passed 78-10 |
2017-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate committee amendment (1) |
2017-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendment (1) |
2017-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-10 with committee amendment (1) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with committee amendment (1) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 74-6 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-03 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-15 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | introduced in House |