KY HB375 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - WITHDRAWN
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - WITHDRAWN
Summary
Amend KRS 205.6485 to delete the requirement for a premium payment for insurance coverage under the Kentucky Children's Health Insurance Programs and permit the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish premium payments by administrative regulation.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Children's Health Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Jimmie Lee [D] |
Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Charles Siler [R] | Rep. David Watkins [D] |
Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-16 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-16 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-16 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-05 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed | |
2010-02-23 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-22 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-02-19 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-18 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-09 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-08 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2010-02-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB375.htm |