KY HB381 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.637 to provide that local school districts shall not be required to reimburse Kentucky Retirement Systems for retiree health care premiums on reemployed retirees who work less than 80 days a year; provide that the days counted towards the eighty day requirement must constitute at least four hours per day.
Title
AN ACT relating to reemployment after retirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Rick Nelson [D] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2012-03-19 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-16 | 3rd reading, passed 70-20 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-15 | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn | |
2012-03-13 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-12 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2012 | |
2012-03-09 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-28 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-09 | to State Government (H) | |
2012-02-08 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB381.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB381/bill.doc |