KY HB391 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establish a new subchapter under KRS Chapter 154 and create new sections thereof to allow the earn and learn tax credit in an amount up to 25% of the costs incurred by an approved company for tuition or other educational expenses paid on behalf of a qualified employee, not to exceed $1,500 and up to 50% of those costs incurred for a qualified employee in recovery, not to exceed $2,000; create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to allow the tax credit against the income taxes and the limited liability entity tax for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2019, but before January 1, 2023; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the tax credit; amend KRS 131.190 to allow the Department of Revenue to report to the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to a new tax credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-15Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback