KY HB403 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 533 to authorize the use of day reporting programs in criminal sentencing.
Title
AN ACT relating to day reporting programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-3 |
2016-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-16 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-02-12 | House | introduced in House |