KY HB412 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 367, relating to consumer protection, to regulate the business of pre-settlement funding where funds are provided to a civil litigant and repaid only out of the proceeds of the lawsuit; include provisions that address required contractual disclosures and terms, prohibited activities by funding companies, registration of funding companies with the Attorney General, and enforcement authority within the Attorney General's office.
Title
AN ACT relating to pre-settlement funding providers and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-28 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-28 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-25 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-25 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-25 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-23 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | passed 68-24 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2011-02-18 | floor amendment (2) defeated | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd reading | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) filed | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-14 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-10 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2011-02-09 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB412.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB412/bill.doc |