KY HB421 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 109.012 to establish definitions for "authorized company," "displace," "franchise," and "local government" and amend the definition of "solid waste management services" to include special wastes; create new section of KRS Chapter 109 to require hearing and notice for the displacement of waste haulers; amend KRS 224.43-315 to require contracts between the county and waste hauler to include nondesignated cities that it serves; amend KRS 224.43-345 to include representatives of cities on advisory committees; and amend KRS 224.50-760 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to local government solid waste management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-18 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | introduced in House |