KY HB444 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 227A.060 to modify experience and education requirements for an electrician or master electrician license; require an electrician applicant or master electrician applicant to have 8,000 hours or 16,000 hours of verifiable experience, respectively, which may be reduced by designated education or teaching; authorize a master electrician or electrician applicant to qualify for licensure through teaching or attending an associate's degree or diploma program at a college within the Kentucky Community and Technical College System or at another accredited college or university; enable a military veteran to meet master electrician or electrician experience requirements through applicable supervised military occupational specialty experience; direct the department of Housing, Buildings and Construction to promulgate administrative regulations to establish an application form to allow submission of military experience; accept either a DD-214 form or a signed statement from the applicant's commanding officer to verify relevant military experience; amend KRS 227A.100 to renew electrician licenses once every two years; allow a licensee to request either a physical or electronic license.
Title
AN ACT relating to electricians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3120 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 223 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 223 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-5 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-03-05 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 04, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-09 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Electricians
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
State Agencies
Veterans
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Electricians
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
State Agencies
Veterans