KY HB470 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 367.410 to define "department"; amend KRS 367.450 to provide that sellers of goods or services related to insurance or service contracts who are regulated by the Department of Insurance are exempt from requirements related to home solicitation sales.
Title
AN ACT relating to home solicitation sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3080 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 214 (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 214 (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-7 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-13 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 75-20 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 05, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-12 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | introduced in House |