KY HB475 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 20)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 20)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 241.010 to define a state park; add state park local option elections to the list of moist elections; create a new section of KRS Chapter 242 to allow a local option election for the sale of alcoholic beverages by the drink at state parks; hold the election in the precinct where the state park's qualifying lodge or golf course is located; establish the petition question and the form of the proposition for the election; make the entire state park moist if the majority of voters in the precinct favor establishing moist territory; amend KRS 243.082 to allow an authorized state park to acquire an NQ1 retail drink license; set the limitations and privileges of a state park NQ1 license; amend KRS 243.100 to add governmental agencies to the types of corporate entities eligible to receive an alcoholic beverage license.
Title
AN ACT relating to local option elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 20) |
2014-03-21 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-21 | House | received in House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-7 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 20, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 65-30 |
2014-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 10, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | posting waived |
2014-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-04 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | introduced in House |