KY HB477 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 139.480 to exempt from sales and use tax poultry or livestock bedding purchased on and after August 1, 2014, but before July 31, 2018.
Title
AN ACT relating to sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Ben Waide [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB477.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB477/bill.doc |