KY HB56 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section within KRS Chapter 335.010 to 335.170 to declare the purpose of the Social Work Licensure Compact; define terms; set requirements for states that want to enter the compact; grant a multistate licensure privilege to practice for regulated social workers; establish provisions for active duty military personnel or their spouses; recognize a multistate licensure privilege to practice for regulated social workers in any member state via telehealth; designate procedures for adverse actions a home and member state can take against a social worker; create the Social Work Licensure Compact Commission; establish and elect an executive committee; provide immunity for party states, officers, employees, or representatives of the commission who act in accordance with the compact; require the commission to create, maintain, operate, and use a coordinated database and reporting system containing licensure, adverse actions, and investigative information on all licensed individuals in member states; establish rulemaking procedures; authorize the commission to attempt to resolve disputes related to the compact that arise among member states and between member and nonmember states; create compact withdrawal procedures for a member state; include severability for any provision in the compact that is contrary to the constitution of any party state or of the United States or the applicability to any government, agency, person, or circumstance; describe Kentucky state procedures that affect the applicability of the compact.
Title
AN ACT relating to licensed professionals.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Fleming [R] | Rep. Lisa Willner [D] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. Steve Bratcher [R] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3117 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 157 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 157 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-2 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-02-13 | House | recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2024-02-13 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2024-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 12, 2024 |
2024-02-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-31 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-18 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Boards and Commissions
Compacts, Interstate
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Boards and Commissions
Compacts, Interstate
Licensing
Occupations and Professions