KY HB605 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 67C to provide for the election of a mayor and members of a legislative body in a consolidated local government on a nonpartisan basis; amend KRS 67C.103 and 67C.105 to conform: amend KRS 83A.045 to provide that mayors and members of the legislative body of any city shall be elected on a nonpartisan basis; amend KRS 83A.040, 83A.165, 83A.170, 83A.175, 118.225, and 118.367 to conform; repeal KRS 83A.050; effective November 4, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Lee [R] | Rep. Jim Duplessis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | floor amendments (1) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
County Clerks
Effective Dates, Delayed
Elections and Voting
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Consolidated Local Governments
County Clerks
Effective Dates, Delayed
Elections and Voting
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb605.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb605/orig_bill.pdf |