KY HB621 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 247.140 to add the North American Championship Rodeo and the National Farm Machinery Show's Championship Tractor Pull to the list of shows and expositions owned and operated by the State Fair Board.
Title
AN ACT relating to the State Fair Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3097 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 246 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 246 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-13 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 |
2024-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Agriculture
Amusements and Recreation
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Boards and Commissions
Economic Development
Fairs
Horses and Horse Racing
Tourism
Amusements and Recreation
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Boards and Commissions
Economic Development
Fairs
Horses and Horse Racing
Tourism