KY HB64 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 620.250 to allow local foster care review boards to have access to the educational records of children committed to the custody of the Commonwealth by requiring the Kentucky Department of Education to provide the educational records free of charge to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; amend KRS 610.125 to require recommendations concerning the transition from out-of-home care to independent living to be made to a court by the Department of Juvenile Justice regarding a child in their care.
Title
AN ACT relating to child welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Crimm [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-06 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB64.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB64/bill.doc |