KY HB66 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 271B.1-400, 14A.3-010, 271B.2-020, 271B.6-260, 271B.7-400, 271B.8-300, 271B.13-020, and 271B.16-210, and create a new section of subtitle 11 of KRS Chapter 271B to establish public benefit corporations.
Title
AN ACT relating to public benefit corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-01-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 58-34 |
2014-01-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 14, 2014 |
2014-01-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-07 | House | posting waived |
2014-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB66.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB66/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB66/vote_history.pdf |