KY HB67 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - 3rd reading, defeated 15-21 with Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - 3rd reading, defeated 15-21 with Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.7874 to define the minimum number of cumulative credit hours needed to be considered "on track to graduate" at the end of each award period for KEES scholarship renewal requirements.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky educational excellence scholarship.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Flood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, defeated 15-21 with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-6 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-06 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |