KY HB715 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 36.474 to remove the post-deployment provision relating to eligibility for the military family assistance trust fund; make technical correction; amend KRS 36.477 to expand the Kentucky National Guard Adoption Assistance Program to include former members of the Kentucky National Guard and allow adoption of stepchildren to qualify; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky National Guard and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3180 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 242 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 242 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2024-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 07, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |