KY HB73 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-04 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-04 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 600.020 to establish a new definition for "independent living" as it relates to a child committed to the custody of the Commonwealth; amend KRS 620.140 to establish that a child committed to the custody of the Commonwealth may request, no later than 12 months after attaining the age of 18 years, to extend or reinstate the commitment; amend KRS 620.250 to allow local foster care review boards to have access to the educational records of children committed to the custody of the Commonwealth.
Title
AN ACT relating to child welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Crimm [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-03-04 | 2nd reading | |
2011-03-04 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-03-03 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-03-03 | 1st reading | |
2011-03-03 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-18 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-16 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-11 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2011 | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-01 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB73.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB73/bill.doc |