KY HB74 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 41 to create within the Office of the State Treasurer a trust to be used to establish accounts for the benefit of disabled persons as a companion to the federal ABLE Account legislation; amend KRS 205.200 to provide that ownership or activity of an ABLE Account shall not be used when conducting means-based testing for eligibility measurements for public assistance programs.
Title
AN ACT relating to persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] | Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Leslie Combs [D] |
Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] |
Rep. Thomas Kerr [R] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Kevin Sinnette [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-02-08 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10 |
2016-02-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-01-12 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-10-28 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |